Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Jan Nepomuckı Kalous

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Gratianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1836Born
12 Jul 186630.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
15 Jul 186630.3Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
1 Oct 189155.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
1 Oct 189155.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
25 Oct 189155.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
19 Sep 190771.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Jan Nepomuckı Kalous (VIAF: 83764690)
Bishop Ferdinand Jan Nepomuckı Kalous (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCernı, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}
Ordained BishopPraha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • op/ob/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 291
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017