Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Schwarz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Anastasiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1828Born
26 Jul 185223.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
29 Jul 185223.8Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
27 Mar 188455.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
27 Mar 188455.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
18 May 188455.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
1891¹62.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Karl Schwarz (VIAF: 297378768)
Bishop Karl Schwarz (born , died 1891) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrozdow, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}
Ordained BishopPraha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 98
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017