Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale Maria Jaderosa

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

Titular Bishop of Birtha


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1824Born
18 Sep 184723.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 188459.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
24 Mar 188459.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Birtha
30 Mar 188459.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Birtha
1896¹71.6ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
2 Mar 190075.7DiedCoadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Maria Jaderosa
Bishop Pasquale Maria Jaderosa (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCervino
Ordained BishopS. Andre delle Fratte, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 80, and Page 149
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1884, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017