Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Addessi

Deceased

Bishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1830Born
24 Sep 185323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Gaeta, Italy
24 Mar 188454.0AppointedBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy
30 Mar 188454.1Ordained BishopBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy
1904¹73.8DiedBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Addessi
Bishop Vincenzo Addessi (born , died 1904) Bishop of Diano-Teggiano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFondi
Ordained BishopS. Andre delle Fratte, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 244
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1884, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017