Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Damian Johannes Theelen, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1877BornBeesel
23 Sep 189922.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
21 May 191538.1AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
15 Aug 191538.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
6 Aug 194669.3DiedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria

MicroData Summary for Damian Johannes Theelen:
Bishop Damian Johannes Theelen C.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Nicopoli

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1947
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1915, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013