Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Costantino Costa, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1841Born
29 Apr 189048.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania
29 Apr 189048.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Antipatris
4 May 189048.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antipatris
12 Jun 189351.7AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
15 Sep 189756.0DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Costantino Costa
Bishop Costantino Costa C.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Segni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania
Ordained BishopSts John and Paul, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 110, and Page 518
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 May 2012
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1890, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017