Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Joseph Girouard, M.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Morondava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1898BornHamilton, RI, USA
26 Jul 192728.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
30 Dec 195456.0AppointedPrefect of Morondava, Madagascar
7 Nov 195556.9AppointedBishop of Morondava, Madagascar
7 Mar 195657.2Ordained BishopBishop of Morondava, Madagascar
20 Feb 196465.1DiedBishop of Morondava, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Paul Joseph Girouard:
Bishop Paul Joseph Girouard M.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Morondava

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013