Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Russell Joseph McVinney

Deceased

Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1898BornWarren
13 Jul 192425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
29 May 194849.5AppointedBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
14 Jul 194849.6Ordained BishopBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
10 Aug 197172.7DiedBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA

MicroData Summary for Russell Joseph McVinney:
Bishop Russell Joseph McVinney (born , died ) Bishop of Providence

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013