Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Roque

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of United States of America, Military

Titular Bishop of Bagai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1928Born
19 Sep 195324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
29 Mar 198354.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military
29 Mar 198354.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bagai
10 May 198354.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bagai
15 Sep 200475.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military
12 Sep 201990.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of United States of America, Military

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Roque
Bishop Francis Xavier Roque (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of United States of America, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceProvidence, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island
Death PlaceJeanne Jugan Residence, Pawtucket, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island
Buried Place (Original)St. Ann, Cemetery, Cranson, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island

  • a priest for 65.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 13 Sep 2019
  • 23.loc: CB, 16 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 7 Dec 2019

Quantcast