Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Gregory Murray

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1877BornWaterbury, CT
14 Apr 190023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
15 Nov 191942.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
15 Nov 191942.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Flavias
28 Apr 192043.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flavias
29 May 192548.3AppointedBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
12 Oct 192548.6InstalledBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
29 Oct 193154.7AppointedArchbishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
27 Jan 193254.9InstalledArchbishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
11 Oct 195679.6DiedArchbishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for John Gregory Murray:
Archbishop John Gregory Murray (born , died ) Archbishop of Saint Paul

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1920, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013