Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice Francis McAuliffe

Deceased

Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1875BornHartford
29 Jul 190025.1Ordained PriestPriest of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
17 Dec 192550.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
17 Dec 192550.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dercos (Dercus)
28 Apr 192650.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dercos (Dercus)
23 Apr 193458.8AppointedBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
15 Dec 194469.5DiedBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for Maurice Francis McAuliffe:
Bishop Maurice Francis McAuliffe (born , died ) Bishop of Hartford

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013