Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Francis Brady

Deceased

Bishop of Manchester, New Hampshire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1893BornWaterbury
10 Jun 191623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
30 Jul 193845.5AppointedBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
26 Oct 193845.8Ordained BishopBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
11 Nov 194451.8AppointedBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
20 Sep 195966.7DiedBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA

MicroData Summary for Matthew Francis Brady:
Bishop Matthew Francis Brady (born , died ) Bishop of Manchester

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013