Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Edward McCarthy

Deceased

Bishop of Portland, Maine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1876BornWaterbury
4 Jul 190326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
13 May 193255.5AppointedBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
24 Aug 193255.8Ordained BishopBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
8 Sep 195578.8DiedBishop of Portland, Maine, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Edward McCarthy:
Bishop Joseph Edward McCarthy (born , died ) Bishop of Portland

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013