Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Francis Joyce

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Burlington, Vermont


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1896BornProctor
26 May 192326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Burlington, Vermont, USA
8 Jul 195457.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
8 Jul 195457.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Citium
28 Oct 195458.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Citium
29 Dec 195660.2AppointedBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
14 Dec 197175.1RetiredBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
2 Sep 199093.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Burlington, Vermont, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Francis Joyce:
Bishop Robert Francis Joyce (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Burlington

  • a priest for 67.2 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015