Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph John Rice

Deceased

Bishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1871Born
29 Sep 189422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
8 Jan 191038.0AppointedBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
14 Apr 191038.3Ordained BishopBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
31 Mar 193866.3DiedBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph John Rice
Bishop Joseph John Rice (born , died ) Bishop of Burlington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeicester, MA

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 97
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018