Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Augustine Hickey

Deceased

Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1869Born
22 Dec 189324.6Ordained PriestPriest of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
10 Mar 191949.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
10 Mar 191949.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
10 Apr 191949.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
25 May 192152.0SucceededBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
4 Oct 193364.3DiedBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA

MicroData Summary for William Augustine Hickey
Bishop William Augustine Hickey (born , died ) Bishop of Providence

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWorcester, MA

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,919, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast