Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Francis Feehan

Deceased

Bishop of Fall River, Massachusetts


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1855BornAthol, MA
29 Dec 187924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
3 Jul 190751.7AppointedBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
19 Sep 190751.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
19 Jul 193478.8DiedBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel Francis Feehan:
Bishop Daniel Francis Feehan (born , died ) Bishop of Fall River

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 50
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 321

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 1 Jun 2015