Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John Edward Morris, M.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Peng-yang


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1889BornMaryknoll, USA
13 Jun 191425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
31 Jan 192132.1ProfessedMember of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
1 Apr 193041.3AppointedPrefect of Peng-yang, Korea (North)
31 Jul 193647.6ResignedPrefect of Peng-yang, Korea (North)
10 Jul 198798.5DiedPrefect Emeritus of Peng-yang, Korea (North)

MicroData Summary for John Edward Morris:
Priest John Edward Morris M.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Peng-yang

  • a priest for 73.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • email: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013