Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Tierney

Deceased

Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1839BornBallylooby, Ireland
26 May 186626.7Ordained PriestPriest of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
21 Dec 189354.2AppointedBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
22 Feb 189454.4Ordained BishopBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
5 Oct 190869.0DiedBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Tierney:
Bishop Michael Tierney (born , died ) Bishop of Hartford

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 300

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013