Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Matthew Lowney

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA

Titular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1863Born
17 Dec 188724.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Aug 191754.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
24 Aug 191754.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade
23 Oct 191754.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade
13 Aug 191855.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA

MicroData Summary for Denis Matthew Lowney
Bishop Denis Matthew Lowney (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Providence

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastletown-Bar Haven, Ireland

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 38
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast