Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Joseph Shahan

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Germanicopolis

Titular See: (Rector/Catholic University of America)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1857Born
3 Jun 188224.7Ordained PriestPriest of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
24 Jul 191456.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
15 Nov 191457.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
9 Mar 193274.4DiedTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Shahan (VIAF: 48392202)
Bishop Thomas Joseph Shahan (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Germanicopolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManchester, NH, Diocese of Portland, Maine, USA
Death PlaceWashington, D.C., Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
Buried Place (Original)National Shrine of the Immaculate Conception, Basilica, Washington, D.C., Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 65
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 1 May 2019

Quantcast