Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Paul Adam Curran, O.P. †

Deceased

Prefect of Jian’ou [Kienow, Kienning], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1889Born
18 Sep 191324.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
10 May 191828.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
18 Mar 193242.6AppointedSuperior of Kienow [Jian’ou], China
18 Jan 193747.4ResignedSuperior of Kienow [Jian’ou], China
2 Jul 194858.9AppointedPrefect of Jian’ou [Kienow, Kienning], China
23 Sep 195364.1DiedPrefect of Jian’ou [Kienow, Kienning], China

MicroData Summary for Paul Adam Curran
Father Paul Adam Curran O.P. (born , died ) Prefect of Jian’ou [Kienow, Kienning]

EventPlace
Birth PlacePittsburgh, PA, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
Ordained PriestDominican House of Studies, Chapel, Washington, D.C., Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
Death PlaceDominican House of Studies, Washington, D.C., Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
Buried Place (Original)Dominican Father's plot, St. Joseph's, Cemetery, Washington, D.C., Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

  • a priest for 35.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: CB, 29 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Mar 2017