Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ambrose Valerian Hayden

Deceased

Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1918Born
29 Jan 194425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
20 Apr 196748.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
20 Apr 196748.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamsorti
1968¹49.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
1968¹49.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Lamsorti
24 Jun 199778.8DiedPriest of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ambrose Valerian Hayden
Father Ambrose Valerian Hayden (born , died ) Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Saint Paul and Minneapolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Sueur, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota
Ordained PriestSt. Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota
Buried Place (Original)Calvary, Cemetery, Le Sueur, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota

  • a priest for 53.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 3
  • b: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 59, Page 439, and Page 749

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 22 Jan 2019

Quantcast