Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerald Francis O’Keefe

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Davenport, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1918Born
29 Jan 194425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
5 May 196143.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
5 May 196143.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Candyba
2 Jul 196143.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Candyba
20 Oct 196648.5AppointedBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
4 Jan 196748.7InstalledBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
12 Nov 199375.6RetiredBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
12 Apr 200082.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Davenport, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Gerald Francis O’Keefe
(VIAF: 36036828; WikiData: Q5549154)
Bishop Gerald Francis O’Keefe (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Davenport

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota
Ordained PriestSt. Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota
Ordained BishopCathedral, St. Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota
Death PlaceDavenport, Diocese of Davenport, Iowa

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • i/dave: Website of the Diocese, 18 Aug 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1961, Number 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 25 Jun 2024