Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Zimmermann, M.S.F. †

Deceased

Bishop of Morombe, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1923Born
29 Jun 195026.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
28 May 196036.4AppointedBishop of Morombe, Madagascar
23 Oct 196036.8Ordained BishopBishop of Morombe, Madagascar
4 Dec 198864.9DiedBishop of Morombe, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Joseph Zimmermann
Bishop Joseph Zimmermann M.S.F. (born , died ) Bishop of Morombe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBirmenstorf, Switzerland

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,960, Number 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast