Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz von Streng

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland

Titular Bishop of Obbi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1884Born
12 Jul 190824.3Ordained PriestPriest of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
17 Nov 193652.7SelectedBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
30 Nov 193652.7ConfirmedBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
24 Jan 193752.9Ordained BishopBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
3 Nov 196783.6RetiredBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
3 Nov 196783.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Obbi
7 Aug 197086.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Franz von Streng
Bishop Franz von Streng (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Basel e Lugano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSirnach

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1937, Number 4
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 411, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 573, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast