Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Vonderach

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1916BornUnterschächen
7 Jul 194024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Chur, Switzerland
31 Oct 195741.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chur, Switzerland
31 Oct 195741.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aradi
8 Dec 195741.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aradi
18 Jan 196245.6SucceededBishop of Chur, Switzerland
22 Jan 196245.7InstalledBishop of Chur, Switzerland
22 May 199074.0RetiredBishop of Chur, Switzerland
10 Feb 199477.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Johannes Vonderach:
Bishop Johannes Vonderach (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chur

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015