Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vitus Huonder

Bishop Emeritus of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1942 Born
25 Sep 197129.4Ordained PriestPriest of Chur, Switzerland
8 Jul 200765.2AppointedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
8 Sep 200765.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
20 May 201977.0RetiredBishop of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Vitus Huonder
Bishop Vitus Huonder (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Chur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrun
Ordained BishopAbbey, Einsiedeln, Diocese of Chur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,505
  • r: Bollettino, 20 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 20 May 2019

Quantcast