Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marian Eleganti, O.S.B.

Auxiliary Bishop of Chur

Titular Bishop of Lamdia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1955 BornUznach
2 Oct 199136.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Oct 199439.5Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Jun 199540.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Dec 200954.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chur, Switzerland
7 Dec 200954.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamdia
31 Jan 201054.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamdia

MicroData Summary for Marian Eleganti:
Bishop Marian Eleganti O.S.B. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,564

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013