Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Viktor Bieler

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1881BornTermen-Brig
7 Jul 190726.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
3 Jul 191938.3AppointedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
27 Jul 191938.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
19 Mar 195271.0DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Viktor Bieler:
Bishop Viktor Bieler (born , died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 44
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013