Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Bernard Alexis Burquier, C.R.A. †

Deceased

Abbot of Saint-Maurice

Titular Bishop of Bethleem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1871BornSaint-Paul en Chablais, France
189119.6ProfessedMember of Missionaries of St. Francis de Sales d’Annecy
3 Apr 189725.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of St. Francis de Sales d’Annecy
190735.6IncardinatedPriest of Swiss Congregation of Canons Regular of Saint Maurice of Agaune
8 Aug 193261.2SelectedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
18 Aug 193261.2ConfirmedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
18 Aug 193261.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
21 Sep 193261.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethleem
30 Mar 194371.8DiedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Bernard Alexis Burquier:
Abbot Bernard Alexis Burquier C.R.A. (born , died ) Abbot of Saint-Maurice

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013