Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Ambühl

Deceased

Bishop of Basel e Lugano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1873BornLuzern
24 Jul 189825.6Ordained PriestPriest of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
2 Jun 192552.4SelectedBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
30 Jun 192552.5ConfirmedBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
27 Sep 192552.7Ordained BishopBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
17 Oct 193663.8DiedBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ambühl:
Bishop Joseph Ambühl (born , died ) Bishop of Basel e Lugano

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013