Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Schmid von Grüneck

Deceased

Bishop of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1851Born
11 Apr 187523.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Chur, Switzerland
1 Aug 187523.6Ordained PriestPriest of Chur, Switzerland
7 May 190856.4SelectedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
13 Jul 190856.6ConfirmedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
4 Oct 190856.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
6 May 193280.4DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Georg Schmid von Grüneck (VIAF: 65009790)
Bishop Georg Schmid von Grüneck (born , died ) Bishop of Chur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSurrhein
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chur, Diocese of Chur

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1908, Number 57
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 630
  • od/c1: CB, 8 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast