Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johannes Fidelis Battaglia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chur, Switzerland

Titular Archbishop of Cyzicus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1829Born
2 Jun 185526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chur, Switzerland
6 Nov 188859.7SelectedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
14 Feb 188959.9ConfirmedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
31 Mar 188960.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
12 Feb 190878.9RetiredBishop of Chur, Switzerland
3 Jul 190980.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyzicus
10 Sep 191384.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Johannes Fidelis Battaglia (VIAF: 314873894)
Archbishop Johannes Fidelis Battaglia (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chur

EventPlace
Birth PlacePräsanz, Diocese of Chur
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chur, Diocese of Chur

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 234
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017