Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raymund (Albin) Netzhammer, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania

Titular Archbishop of Anazarbus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1862Born
8 Sep 188119.6Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Sep 188624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Sep 190543.6AppointedArchbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania
5 Nov 190543.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania
14 Jul 192462.4ResignedArchbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania
14 Jul 192462.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus
18 Sep 194583.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Raymund (Albin) Netzhammer (VIAF: 59229288)
Archbishop Raymund (Albin) Netzhammer O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bucarest {Bucureşti}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKlettgau-Erzingen, Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
Ordained PriestChur, Diocese of Chur, Switzerland
Ordained BishopSan Anselmo, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceInsel Werd bei Stein am Rhein

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1946
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1905, Number 48
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 94
  • b: Biographia Benedictina, 17 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Sep 2021

Quantcast