Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alexandru Theodor Cisar

Deceased

Archbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1880BornBucuresti
6 Jun 190322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania
22 Apr 192039.5AppointedBishop of Iaşi, Romania
15 Aug 192039.8Ordained BishopBishop of Iaşi, Romania
25 Aug 192039.8InstalledBishop of Iaşi, Romania
12 Dec 192444.1AppointedArchbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania
7 Jan 195473.2DiedArchbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Alexandru Theodor Cisar:
Archbishop Alexandru Theodor Cisar (born , died ) Archbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,232
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 4 Feb 2014