Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Glaser

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Caesaropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1880Born
24 Jun 190525.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 194363.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
25 Jul 194363.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
25 May 195070.0DiedTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis

MicroData Summary for Marco Glaser
Bishop Marco Glaser (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Caesaropolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLandau

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018