Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gheorghe Guţiu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cluj-Gherla (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1924BornViadei
8 Dec 194824.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 199065.9AppointedBishop of Cluj-Gherla (Romanian), Romania
17 Jun 199066.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cluj-Gherla (Romanian), Romania
20 Jul 199470.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cluj-Gherla (Romanian), Romania
18 Jul 200278.3RetiredBishop of Cluj-Gherla (Romanian), Romania
8 May 201187.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Cluj-Gherla (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Gheorghe Guţiu:
Archbishop Gheorghe Guţiu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cluj-Gherla

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,973
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015