Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lucian Cardinal Mureşan

Major Archbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian)

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Atanasio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1931 BornFerneziu
19 Dec 196433.6Ordained PriestPriest of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania
14 Mar 199058.8AppointedBishop of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania
27 May 199059.0Ordained BishopBishop of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania
4 Jul 199463.1AppointedArchbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
16 Dec 200574.6AppointedMajor Archbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
30 Apr 200674.9InstalledMajor Archbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
18 Feb 201280.7Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 201280.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Atanasio
8 Oct 201281.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Atanasio

MicroData Summary for Lucian Mureşan:
Cardinal Lucian Mureşan (born ) Major Archbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,877
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1a20: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • i: Bollettino, 3 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013