Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ioan Şişeştean

Deceased

Bishop of Maramureş (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1936BornŞişeşti
13 Mar 197235.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 199458.1AppointedBishop of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania
11 Sep 199458.3Ordained BishopBishop of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania
12 Apr 201174.8DiedBishop of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Ioan Şişeştean:
Bishop Ioan Şişeştean (born , died ) Bishop of Maramureş

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 444
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,366
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,435
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013