Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandru Mesian

Bishop of Lugoj (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1937 BornBaia Mare
8 May 196528.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 199457.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
8 Sep 199457.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
20 Nov 199558.8SucceededBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Alexandru Mesian:
Bishop Alexandru Mesian (born ) Bishop of Lugoj

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lugoj (Romanian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,364
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Sep 2014