Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claudiu-Lucian Pop

Curial Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian)

Titular Bishop of Mariamme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1972 BornPiscolt, Romania
23 Jul 199523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
21 Nov 201139.3AppointedCurial Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
21 Nov 201139.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mariamme
8 Dec 201139.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mariamme

MicroData Summary for Claudiu-Lucian Pop:
Bishop Claudiu-Lucian Pop (born ) Curial Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c1: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2011
  • ob/c23: CB, 22 Nov 2011
  • c4: CB, 28 Nov 2011
  • c2: CB, 5 Dec 2011
  • c2+: CB, 8 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,186

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013