Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Călin Ioan Bot

Bishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1970 Born
15 Aug 199525.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Cluj-Gherla (Claudiopoli-Armenopoli) (Romanian), Romania
10 Sep 199525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cluj-Gherla (Claudiopoli-Armenopoli) (Romanian), Romania
22 Jan 202049.4ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
22 Jan 202049.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Abrittum
21 Jun 202049.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abrittum
16 Mar 202352.6AppointedArchiepiscopal Administrator of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
15 Jun 202352.8ConfirmedBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
20 Jul 202352.9InstalledBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Călin Ioan Bot
(WikiData: Q83421249)
Bishop Călin Ioan Bot (born ) Bishop of Lugoj

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSălaj, Diocese of Cluj-Gherla (Claudiopoli-Armenopoli) (Romanian)
Ordained DeaconNicula
Ordained PriestTihău
Ordained BishopSfânta Treime, Cathedral, Blaj

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lugoj (Romanian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2020
  • od/c0: CB, 28 Jan 2020
  • ob: CB, 5 Feb 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 Jun 2020
  • c34: CB, 21 Jun 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 244, Number 20,395
  • aadm: CB, 17 Mar 2023
  • conf: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2023
  • i: AM, 18 Jun 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 20 Jun 2023