Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Virgil Bercea

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1957 BornHubic-Mures
9 Dec 198225.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 199436.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
20 Jul 199436.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pupiana
8 Sep 199436.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pupiana
6 Nov 199638.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
8 Jun 199739.5SucceededBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Virgil Bercea:
Bishop Virgil Bercea (born ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,365
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Sep 2014