Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Giuseppe Jelmini

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Lugano, Switzerland

Titular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1893Born
28 Jun 191723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
16 Dec 193542.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lugano, Switzerland
16 Dec 193542.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
2 Feb 193642.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
24 Jun 196874.6DiedApostolic Administrator of Lugano, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Angelo Giuseppe Jelmini
Bishop Angelo Giuseppe Jelmini (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Lugano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuralto

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Jan 2017