Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giosuč Bicchi

Deceased

Bishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1843Born
31 Mar 186622.5Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 189349.7AppointedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
25 Jun 189349.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
18 Jan 191369.3DiedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giosuč Bicchi
Bishop Giosuč Bicchi (born , died ) Bishop of San Severino (Marche)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Giustino, Diocese of Cittą di Castello
Ordained BishopSte Agnes de la Place Navona, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 516
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017