Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felice di Molfetta

Bishop Emeritus of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1940 BornTerlizzi
29 Jun 196626.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 200060.0AppointedBishop of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy
1 Jul 200060.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy
15 Jul 200060.2InstalledBishop of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy
1 Oct 201575.4RetiredBishop of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice di Molfetta:
Bishop Felice di Molfetta (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,804
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015