Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Bergamaschi

Deceased

Bishop of Montefeltro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1894Born
25 Jul 191723.5Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 194955.9AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
22 Jan 195056.0Ordained BishopBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
17 Apr 196672.2DiedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Bergamaschi
Bishop Antonio Bergamaschi (born , died ) Bishop of Montefeltro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFiorenzuola d'Arda

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,966
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,950, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast