Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Ghizzoni

Deceased

Bishop of San Miniato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1912Born
6 Apr 193523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Piacenza, Italy
23 Dec 196149.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Piacenza, Italy
23 Dec 196149.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thenae
11 Feb 196249.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thenae
Dec 1969³57.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of San Miniato, Italy
25 Jan 197057.8InstalledApostolic Administrator of San Miniato, Italy
15 Apr 197260.0AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
11 Jun 198674.2DiedBishop of San Miniato, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Ghizzoni (VIAF: 89378762)
Bishop Paolo Ghizzoni (born , died ) Bishop of San Miniato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArcello di Pianello Val Tidone, Diocese of Piacenza
Ordained PriestCathedral, Piacenza, Diocese of Piacenza
Death PlacePisa, Archdiocese of Pisa
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, San Miniato, Diocese of San Miniato

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 14
  • c1/opd/loc: AM, 18 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast