Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Poggi

Deceased

Archivist Emeritus of the Vatican Secret Archives

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1917BornPiacenza, Italy
28 Jul 194022.7Ordained PriestPriest of Piacenza, Italy
3 Apr 196547.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Forontoniana
3 Apr 196547.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Other
9 May 196547.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Forontoniana
31 Oct 196648.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Cameroun
31 Oct 196749.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Gabon
21 May 196951.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Peru
1 Aug 197355.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Other
7 Feb 197557.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Poland
19 Apr 198668.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Italy
9 Apr 199274.4AppointedPro-Archivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
9 Apr 199274.4AppointedPro-Librarian of the Vatican Library
26 Nov 199477.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
26 Nov 199477.0Elevated to Cardinal
29 Nov 199477.0AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
29 Nov 199477.0AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
Nov 199880.9RetiredArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
Nov 199880.9RetiredLibrarian of the Vatican Library
24 Feb 200587.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
4 May 201092.4DiedArchivist Emeritus of the Vatican Secret Archives

MicroData Summary for Luigi Poggi:
Cardinal Luigi Poggi (born , died ) Archivist Emeritus of Vatican Secret Archives

  • a priest for 69.8 years
  • a bishop for 45.0 years
  • a cardinal for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013